Status of Legislation
Total Number of Bills: 23
Status as of March 22, 1996: Bill is in the Senate - Recommit to Committee Judicial Proceedings
Status as of March 14, 1996: Bill is in the Senate - Withdrawn Economic and Environmental Affairs
Status as of March 8, 1996: Bill is in the Senate - Re-referred Economic and Environmental Affairs
Status as of March 25, 1996: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Commerce and Government Matters
Status as of April 6, 1996: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Commerce and Government Matters