Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Home Improvement Commission - Guaranty Fund - Claims
Sponsored by
Chair, Economic Matters Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor, Licensing and Regulation)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 211
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing to $7500 the maximum amount of a claim against the Home Improvement Guaranty Fund for which the Maryland Home Improvement Commission may issue a proposed order; and increasing to a maximum of 60 the number of days, following specified notice by the Commission, after which the Commission may bring a specified action in court against a contractor who fails to reimburse the Fund in full for payment of a specified claim.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
11/07/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2014
Legislative Date
1/14/2014
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {443191/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
2/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 211
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/19/2013 11/07/2013 Pre-filed
House 12/19/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/14/2014 1/14/2014 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/24/2014 2/25/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Favorable with Amendments {443191/1 Report Adopted 36
House 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36
House 2/28/2014 2/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 38
Senate 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 37
Senate 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Second Reading Passed 57
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 58
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 211
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-407, 8-410 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM