Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Office of Cemetery Oversight - Perpetual Care Trust Funds and Preneed Trust Accounts - Regulation
Sponsored by
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor, Licensing and Regulation)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 81
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Clarifying that realized capital gains are not income of a perpetual care trust fund and shall be deposited in the trust fund as principal; providing that a specified restriction on the use of perpetual care trust funds to make loans or investments in the real property of a cemetery applies to the buildings and structures appurtenant to the property; clarifying that realized capital gains are income of a preneed trust account; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
11/06/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/11/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {876880/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
27
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Special Order until 2/14 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted
Proceedings
27
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/14/2014
Action
Special Order until 2/18 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2014
Legislative Date
2/20/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/21/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2014
Legislative Date
4/08/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 81
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/19/2013 11/06/2013 Pre-filed
House 12/19/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/22/2014 1/22/2014 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/10/2014 2/11/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/13/2014 2/13/2014 Favorable with Amendments {876880/1 Report Adopted 27
House 2/13/2014 2/13/2014 Special Order until 2/14 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted 27
House 2/14/2014 2/14/2014 Special Order until 2/18 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted 28
House 2/18/2014 2/18/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30
House 2/20/2014 2/20/2014 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 32
Senate 2/21/2014 2/21/2014 First Reading Finance 31
Senate 3/11/2014 3/11/2014 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/27/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 55
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 4/08/2014 4/08/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 81
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-603, 5-604, 5-707, 5-708, 5-709 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM