Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission – Processing and Dispensing Medical Cannabis
Sponsored by
Delegates Glenn, Pena-Melnyk, R. Lewis, Carr, Kipke, Kerr, K. Young, Bagnall, Cullison, Hill, and Pendergrass
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 456
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing an institution of higher education, a related medical facility, or an affiliated biomedical research firm to file with the Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission a registration to purchase medical cannabis for the purpose of conducting a bona fide research project relating to the medical uses, properties, or composition of cannabis; requiring the Commission to allow certain dispensaries and dispensary agents to acquire, possess, transfer, sell, distribute or dispense edible cannabis products; etc.
Committees
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0857
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/20/2018
Legislative Date
11/20/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2019
Legislative Date
1/22/2019
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
4/06/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {226983/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-10)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {218273/1
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Committee Amendment Withdrawn
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 456
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/20/2018 11/20/2018 Pre-filed
House 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Food Containing Medical Cannabis
House 1/22/2019 1/22/2019 Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Hearing 4/05 at 11:00 a.m.
House 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2019 4/06/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable with Amendments {226983/1 Adopted 65
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
Text - Third - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission – Processing and Dispensing Medical Cannabis
House 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (130-10) 66
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Referred Rules 63
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable with Amendments {218273/1 65
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Committee Amendment Withdrawn 65
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable Adopted 65
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Second Reading Passed 65
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 65
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 65
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 456
Text - Chapter - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission – Processing and Dispensing Medical Cannabis
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-3301, 13-3304.1, 13-3306, 13-3307, 13-3309, 13-3311.1, 13-3313, 13-3313.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM