Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Judges' Retirement System - Membership, Benefits, and Reemployment
Sponsored by
Delegate B. Barnes (Chair, Joint Committee on Pensions)
Status
Veto sustained (0-141)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Clarifying that regular interest may not be paid on member contributions of specified members of the Judges' Retirement System under specified circumstances; providing that an individual who was a member of the Judges' Retirement System on or before June 30, 2012, is separated from employment for more than 4 years, and returns to employment in a position that requires membership in the Judges' Retirement System is subject to specified requirements; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0103
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Veto sustained (0-141)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2015
Legislative Date
1/23/2015
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2015
Legislative Date
1/26/2015
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/16/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {264567/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2015
Legislative Date
2/19/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/20/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2015
Legislative Date
3/04/2015
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {259338/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/01/0001 1/13/2016 Veto sustained (0-141)
House 1/22/2015 1/23/2015 First Reading Appropriations
House 1/26/2015 1/26/2015 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/13/2015 2/16/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Favorable with Amendments {264567/1 Report Adopted 25
House 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25
House 2/19/2015 2/19/2015 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 27
Senate 2/20/2015 2/20/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation 27
Senate 3/04/2015 3/04/2015 Hearing 3/19 at 8:30 a.m.
Senate 4/03/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/07/2015 3/31/2015 Favorable with Amendments {259338/1 Report Adopted 58
Senate 4/07/2015 3/31/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/08/2015 4/01/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 59
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 House Concur - Senate Amendments 65
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 65
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Passed Enrolled 65
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
(   27-101, 27-203, 27-204, 27-401, 27-402, 27-405, 27-406, 29-501, 29-502 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page