Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Pensions, Joint Committee On

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0076 (SB0102/CH0010)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Accumulated Contributions of Nonvested Former Members
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0077 (SB0103/CH0150)
Title
Judges' Retirement System - Membership, Benefits, and Reemployment
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0078 (SB0076/CH0007)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Noncontributory Pension Benefit - Definition
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0079 (SB0104/CH0011)
Title
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership and Eligibility for Retirement
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0217 /CH0230 (SB0191)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Credit for Unused Sick Leave - Clarification
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0076 /CH0007 (HB0078)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Noncontributory Pension Benefit - Definition
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0102 /CH0010 (HB0076)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Accumulated Contributions of Nonvested Former Members
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0103 /CH0150 (HB0077)
Title
Judges' Retirement System - Membership, Benefits, and Reemployment
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0104 /CH0011 (HB0079)
Title
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership and Eligibility for Retirement
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0191 (HB0217/CH0230)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Credit for Unused Sick Leave - Clarification
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0076 (SB0102/CH0010) State Retirement and Pension System - Accumulated Contributions of Nonvested Former Members By Request - Other 6 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Appropriations
2/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2015 - 8:30 AM
HB0077 (SB0103/CH0150) Judges' Retirement System - Membership, Benefits, and Reemployment By Request - Other 6 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Appropriations
2/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2015 - 8:30 AM
HB0078 (SB0076/CH0007) State Retirement and Pension System - Noncontributory Pension Benefit - Definition By Request - Other 6 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Appropriations
2/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2015 - 8:30 AM
HB0079 (SB0104/CH0011) Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership and Eligibility for Retirement By Request - Other 6 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Appropriations
2/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/02/2015 - 9:15 AM
HB0217 /CH0230 (SB0191) State Retirement and Pension System - Credit for Unused Sick Leave - Clarification By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 230
Appropriations
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2015 - 8:30 AM
SB0076 /CH0007 (HB0078) State Retirement and Pension System - Noncontributory Pension Benefit - Definition By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 7
Budget and Taxation
2/05/2015 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0102 /CH0010 (HB0076) State Retirement and Pension System - Accumulated Contributions of Nonvested Former Members By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 10
Budget and Taxation
2/05/2015 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0103 /CH0150 (HB0077) Judges' Retirement System - Membership, Benefits, and Reemployment By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 150
Budget and Taxation
2/05/2015 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0104 /CH0011 (HB0079) Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership and Eligibility for Retirement By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 11
Budget and Taxation
2/05/2015 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0191 (HB0217/CH0230) State Retirement and Pension System - Credit for Unused Sick Leave - Clarification By Request - Other 6 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
2/19/2015 - 8:30 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM