Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Residential Property Foreclosure Procedures
Sponsored by
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor, Licensing and Regulation)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 93
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Substituting the Commissioner of Financial Regulation for the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation in certain provisions of law relating to the Foreclosed Property Registry.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2019
Legislative Date
1/18/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Real Property - Residential Property Foreclosure Procedures
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Real Property - Residential Property Foreclosure Procedures
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 93
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Real Property - Residential Property Foreclosure Procedures
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2019 1/18/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Real Property - Residential Property Foreclosure Procedures
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 Hearing 2/05 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 25
Text - Third - Real Property - Residential Property Foreclosure Procedures
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 27
Senate 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 27
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable Adopted 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Second Reading Passed 62A
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Returned Passed 67
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 93
Text - Chapter - Real Property - Residential Property Foreclosure Procedures
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-126, 14-126.1, 14-126.2, 14-126.3, 7-105, 7-105.1, 7-105.10, 7-105.11, 7-105.12, 7-105.12 through 7-105.14, 7-105.14, 7-105.17, 7-105.2, 7-105.2 through 7-105.11, 7-105.5 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM