Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Labor, Licensing And Regulation, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0059 /CH0090
Title
Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Debt Settlement Services
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0060 /CH0091
Title
Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Renaming
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0061 /CH0092
Title
Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Mortgage Lenders, Loan Servicers, and Loan Originators
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0107 /CH0093
Title
Real Property - Residential Property Foreclosure Procedures
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0164
Title
Business Occupations and Professions - Licensing and Regulation of Electricians
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0370 /CH0094
Title
Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Police Force - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0020 /CH0086
Title
Appraisal Management Companies - Notice and Response Requirements for Violations - Repeal of Exception
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0021
Title
Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - State Occupational Mechanical Licensing Boards' Fund - Elevator Safety Review Board
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0066
Title
Labor and Employment - Occupational Safety and Health - Enforcement of Regulations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0067 /CH0087
Title
Financial Institutions – Disclosure of Information From Investigations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0068 /CH0088
Title
Commercial Law - Credit Services Businesses - Information Statements
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0069 /CH0089
Title
Appraisal Management Companies – Annual Fee and Reports
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0059 /CH0090 Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Debt Settlement Services By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 90
Economic Matters
1/30/2019 - 3:00 PM
Finance
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0060 /CH0091 Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Renaming By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 91
Economic Matters
1/30/2019 - 3:00 PM
Finance
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0061 /CH0092 Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Mortgage Lenders, Loan Servicers, and Loan Originators By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 92
Economic Matters
1/30/2019 - 3:00 PM
Finance
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0107 /CH0093 Real Property - Residential Property Foreclosure Procedures By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 93
Environment and Transportation
2/05/2019 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0164 Business Occupations and Professions - Licensing and Regulation of Electricians By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0370 /CH0094 Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Police Force - Repeal By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
Appropriations
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0020 /CH0086 Appraisal Management Companies - Notice and Response Requirements for Violations - Repeal of Exception By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 86
Finance
1/10/2019 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0021 Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - State Occupational Mechanical Licensing Boards' Fund - Elevator Safety Review Board By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Failed (22-25)
Finance
1/24/2019 - 2:30 PM
SB0066 Labor and Employment - Occupational Safety and Health - Enforcement of Regulations By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/24 at 2:30 p.m.
Finance
1/24/2019 - 2:30 PM
SB0067 /CH0087 Financial Institutions – Disclosure of Information From Investigations By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 87
Finance
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0068 /CH0088 Commercial Law - Credit Services Businesses - Information Statements By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 88
Finance
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0069 /CH0089 Appraisal Management Companies – Annual Fee and Reports By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 89
Finance
1/10/2019 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:14 PM