Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment for Multifamily Units Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Korman, Barve, Charkoudian, Fraser-Hidalgo, Holmes, Lehman, Love, Cardin, Healey, Jalisi, Ruth, Stein, Stewart, and Terrasa
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that certain provisions of a recorded covenant or restriction, a declaration, or the bylaws or rules of a condominium or homeowners association are void and unenforceable if they prohibit or unreasonably restrict the installation or use of electric vehicle recharging equipment; authorizing the Maryland Energy Administration to issue multiple electric vehicle recharging equipment rebates to the governing body of a condominium or homeowners association for the lesser of 40% of the costs of the equipment or $5,000; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0734
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0826 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Contingency - on failure of another bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment for Multifamily Units Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {770415/4 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment for Multifamily Units Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (124-14)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings Finance
Proceedings
42
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment for Multifamily Units Act
House 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
House 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Hearing canceled
House 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Favorable with Amendments {770415/4 Adopted 40
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Text - Third - Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment for Multifamily Units Act
House 3/05/2020 3/05/2020 Third Reading Passed (124-14) 42
Senate 3/06/2020 3/03/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings Finance 42
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-111.4, 11B-111.8, 14-129 )
(   9-2009, 9-20B-05 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:35 PM