Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations – Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment (Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment for Multifamily Units Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Korman, Barve, Ciliberti, Fraser-Hidalgo, Holmes, Lehman, Love, Parrott, and Stewart
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that certain provisions of a recorded covenant or restriction, a declaration, or the bylaws or rules of a condominium or homeowners association are void and unenforceable; requiring the governing body of a condominium or homeowners association to approve the installation of electric vehicle recharging equipment in a certain parking space under certain circumstances; requiring certain owners of electric vehicle recharging equipment to be responsible for certain costs and disclosures; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {300115/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-10)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations – Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment (Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment for Multifamily Units Act)
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {300115/1 Adopted 47
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations – Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment (Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment for Multifamily Units Act)
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (130-10) 48A
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 47A
Senate 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-111.4, 11B-111.8, 14-129 )
(   9-20B-05 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM