Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Warrantless Arrests - Assault on Baltimore City Special Enforcement Officer
Sponsored by
Delegate Anderson (By Request - Baltimore City Administration)
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding the authority of a police officer without a warrant to arrest a person suspected of committing a specified assault against a specified Baltimore City special parking enforcement officer or special traffic enforcement officer engaged in the performance of the officer's official duties.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0169
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2015
Legislative Date
1/26/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2015
Legislative Date
1/28/2015
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2015 1/26/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/28/2015 1/28/2015 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
(   3-203 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page