Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Baltimore City Administration

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0123 /CH0068 (SB0186)
Title
Baltimore City - Residential Retention Property Tax Credit - Modification
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0133 (SB0169)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Warrantless Arrests - Assault on Baltimore City Special Enforcement Officer
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0228 (SB0337)
Title
Public Health - Expedited Partner Therapy Program - Repeal of Termination Date
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0363
Title
Crimes - Law Enforcement Officer - Misconduct In Office
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0384
Title
Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Conviction - Not Entitled to a Hearing
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0497 /CH0253 (SB0356)
Title
Property Tax - Exemption - Low Income Housing - Ownership by Limited Liability Company
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0506 (SB0410/CH0168)
Title
Baltimore City - Vehicle Laws - Traffic Safety
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0507 (SB0541/CH0038)
Title
Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit - Supermarkets
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0543 /CH0258 (SB0355)
Title
Baltimore City - Housing Authority of Baltimore City - Subsidiary Entities
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0631 (SB0357)
Title
Program Open Space - Baltimore City Grants - Increase and Inflation Adjustment
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1035 /CH0114 (SB0439)
Title
Baltimore City - Tax Sales
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0169 (HB0133)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Warrantless Arrests - Assault on Baltimore City Special Enforcement Officer
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0186 (HB0123/CH0068)
Title
Baltimore City - Residential Retention Property Tax Credit - Modification
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0337 (HB0228)
Title
Public Health - Expedited Partner Therapy Program - Repeal of Termination Date
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0355 (HB0543/CH0258)
Title
Baltimore City - Housing Authority of Baltimore City - Subsidiary Entities
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0356 (HB0497/CH0253)
Title
Baltimore City - Property Tax Exemption - Low Income Housing
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0357 (HB0631)
Title
Program Open Space - Baltimore City Grants - Increase and Inflation Adjustment
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0439 (HB1035/CH0114)
Title
Baltimore City - Tax Sales
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0541 /CH0038 (HB0507)
Title
Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit - Supermarkets
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0123 /CH0068 (SB0186) Baltimore City - Residential Retention Property Tax Credit - Modification By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 68
Ways and Means
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0133 (SB0169) Criminal Procedure - Warrantless Arrests - Assault on Baltimore City Special Enforcement Officer By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0228 (SB0337) Public Health - Expedited Partner Therapy Program - Repeal of Termination Date By Request - Committee 4 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2015 - 12:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0363 Crimes - Law Enforcement Officer - Misconduct In Office By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0384 Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Conviction - Not Entitled to a Hearing By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0497 /CH0253 (SB0356) Property Tax - Exemption - Low Income Housing - Ownership by Limited Liability Company By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 253
Ways and Means
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0506 (SB0410/CH0168) Baltimore City - Vehicle Laws - Traffic Safety By Request - Committee 4 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0507 (SB0541/CH0038) Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit - Supermarkets By Request - Committee 4 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Ways and Means
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0543 /CH0258 (SB0355) Baltimore City - Housing Authority of Baltimore City - Subsidiary Entities By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 258
Environment and Transportation
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0631 (SB0357) Program Open Space - Baltimore City Grants - Increase and Inflation Adjustment By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1035 /CH0114 (SB0439) Baltimore City - Tax Sales By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 114
Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0169 (HB0133) Criminal Procedure - Warrantless Arrests - Assault on Baltimore City Special Enforcement Officer By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0186 (HB0123/CH0068) Baltimore City - Residential Retention Property Tax Credit - Modification By Request - Committee 4 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Budget and Taxation
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0337 (HB0228) Public Health - Expedited Partner Therapy Program - Repeal of Termination Date By Request - Committee 4 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0355 (HB0543/CH0258) Baltimore City - Housing Authority of Baltimore City - Subsidiary Entities By Request - Committee 4 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0356 (HB0497/CH0253) Baltimore City - Property Tax Exemption - Low Income Housing By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0357 (HB0631) Program Open Space - Baltimore City Grants - Increase and Inflation Adjustment By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0439 (HB1035/CH0114) Baltimore City - Tax Sales By Request - Committee 4 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0541 /CH0038 (HB0507) Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit - Supermarkets By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 38
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM