Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Labor Organizations - Right to Work
Sponsored by
Delegates Miller, Adams, Arentz, M. Fisher, Howard, Impallaria, and Mautz
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting an employer from requiring, as a condition of employment or continued employment, an employee or a prospective employee, under certain circumstances, to join or remain a member of a labor organization, pay charges to a labor organization, or pay a certain amount to a third party; prohibiting an employer from threatening an employee or a prospective employee with certain action; providing certain penalties for violation of the Act; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0126 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Labor Organizations - Right to Work
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Labor Organizations - Right to Work
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-414.1, 6-407, 6-504, 9.5-704 )
(   4-304, 4-701 through 4-707 )
(   16-309, 16-316 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:37 PM