Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of the Environment - Yard Waste, Food Residuals, and Other Organic Materials Diversion and Infrastructure - Study
Sponsored by
Delegates Robinson, Cassilly, Barkley, Carr, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gilchrist, Kelly, Kramer, Lam, Luedtke, Moon, Morhaim, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Reznik, and Waldstreicher
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 384
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of the Environment, in consultation with specified persons, to study, review, explore, identify, and make recommendations regarding specified matters that relate to the diversion of yard waste, food residuals, and other organic materials from refuse disposal facilities, including the status of infrastructure in the State; requiring the Department to provide a final report of its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly by July 1, 2019; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0099
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2017
Legislative Date
1/23/2017
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {510316/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {913024/1 (Delegate Rey) Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {364035/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-2)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 384
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Department of the Environment - Yard Waste and Food Residuals Diversion and Infrastructure - Study
House 1/23/2017 1/23/2017 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Favorable with Amendments {510316/1 Adopted 35
House 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Floor Amendment {913024/1 (Delegate Rey) Adopted 35
House 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
Text - Third - Department of the Environment - Yard Waste, Food Residuals, and Other Organic Materials Diversion and Infrastructure - Study
House 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 37
Senate 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 36
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable with Amendments {364035/1 Adopted 58
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 66
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (134-2) 66
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Department of the Environment - Yard Waste, Food Residuals, and Other Organic Materials Diversion and Infrastructure - Study
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 384
Text - Chapter - Department of the Environment - Yard Waste, Food Residuals, and Other Organic Materials Diversion and Infrastructure - Study
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM