Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Department of Education - School Discipline - Data Collection
Sponsored by
Delegate Washington
Status
In the Senate - Special Order until next session (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education to disaggregate certain discipline-related data in an electronic spreadsheet format for the Department's website; requiring certain discipline-related data to be available as a data download; requiring the Department to provide certain discipline-related data to the public in an accessible electronic spreadsheet format; requiring the Department to report on student discipline data to the Governor and the General Assembly by August 1 each year; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0328 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/15/2020
Legislative Date
10/15/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Department of Education - School Discipline - Data Collection
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/04/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
9 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Department of Education - School Discipline - Data Collection
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-6)
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
11 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
4/12/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {484030/1
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/15/2020 10/15/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - State Department of Education - School Discipline - Data Collection
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/04/2021 2/04/2021 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 9 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Department of Education - School Discipline - Data Collection
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Third Reading Passed (130-6) 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/12/2021 2/10/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 11 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2021 3/10/2021 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/17/2021 3/17/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/18/2021 3/18/2021 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 4/12/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/12/2021 3/23/2021 Favorable with Amendments {484030/1 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/23/2021 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Hershey) Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Age
Last Updated: 4/12/2021 8:28 PM
Click to return on the top page