Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George’s County – Speed Monitoring Systems – Maryland Route 210 (Indian Head Highway) PG 305–19
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 586
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing certain provisions of law that limit the location of speed monitoring systems that may be placed and used on Maryland Route 210 (Indian Head Highway) in Prince George's County; increasing the number of speed monitoring systems that may be placed on Maryland Route 210 in Prince George's County; requiring the State Highway Administration, in conjunction with the Prince George's County Department of Public Works and Transportation, to study the factors contributing to an overabundance of motor vehicle accidents on Maryland Route 210; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {960513/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (98-37)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (41-5)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 586
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Prince George’s County – Speed Monitoring Systems – Maryland Route 210 (Indian Head Highway) PG 305–19
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {960513/1 Adopted 48
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Prince George’s County – Speed Monitoring Systems – Maryland Route 210 (Indian Head Highway) PG 305–19
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (98-37) 49
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48
Senate 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Favorable Adopted 63
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Second Reading Passed 63
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (41-5) 64
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 586
Text - Chapter - Prince George’s County – Speed Monitoring Systems – Maryland Route 210 (Indian Head Highway) PG 305–19
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-809 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM