Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Montgomery County - Maximum Speed Limits Outside Urban Districts MC 24-19
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Decreasing the lowest maximum speed limit that Montgomery County may establish for a highway outside an urban district under certain circumstances from 25 miles an hour to 20 miles an hour.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0332 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2019
Legislative Date
1/29/2019
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {990117/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-5)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Montgomery County - Maximum Speed Limits Outside Urban Districts MC 24-19
House 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments {990117/1 Adopted 40
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Text - Third - Montgomery County - Maximum Speed Limits Outside Urban Districts MC 24-19
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Third Reading Passed (135-5) 42
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 42
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 12:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-803 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM