Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Montgomery County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0202
Title
Department of the Environment - SepticSmart Week in Montgomery County MC 17-19
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0203
Title
Montgomery County - Maximum Speed Limits Outside Urban Districts MC 24-19
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0297 /CH0624
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sale of Chilled Beer and Chilled Wine MC 4-19
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0302 /CH0561
Title
Montgomery County Housing Opportunities Commission - Collective Bargaining - Exclusive Representative Duty of Fair Representation MC 26-19
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0304 /CH0167
Title
Montgomery County - Authority of County Council Over Inspector General - Montgomery College MC 12-19
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0333
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Breweries and Farm Breweries MC 18-19
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0334 /CH0633
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Community Performing Arts Facility Special Event Permit MC 30-19
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0335 /CH0634
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Fee Refunds MC 28-19
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0344 /CH0168
Title
Montgomery County - Authority of County Council Over Inspector General - Housing Opportunities Commission MC 7-19
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0345 /CH0637
Title
Montgomery County – Damascus – Alcoholic Beverages Licenses MC 9–19
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0562
Title
Montgomery County - Sale of Residential Real Property - Septic Systems Outreach Toolkit MC 16-19
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0563 /CH0169
Title
Montgomery County - Gaming and Benefit Performances - Repeal MC 14-19
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0564 /CH0170
Title
Montgomery County - Gaming - Bingo Games MC 1-19
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0614
Title
Montgomery County - Vehicle Laws - Prohibited Acts at Intersections MC 10-19
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0616 /CH0673
Title
Montgomery County - Department of Liquor Control - Renaming MC 2-19
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0624
Title
Montgomery County - Voting Methods MC 29-19
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0628
Title
Montgomery County - Residential Leases - Just Cause Eviction MC 22-19
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0642
Title
Montgomery County - Uniformity of Property Tax Assessments - Use of Pesticides by Country Clubs and Golf Courses MC 11-19
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0651
Title
Montgomery County - Country Clubs and Golf Courses - Rate of Assessment and Term of Agreements MC 27-19
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0202 Department of the Environment - SepticSmart Week in Montgomery County MC 17-19 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0203 Montgomery County - Maximum Speed Limits Outside Urban Districts MC 24-19 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 12:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0297 /CH0624 Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sale of Chilled Beer and Chilled Wine MC 4-19 By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 624
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0302 /CH0561 Montgomery County Housing Opportunities Commission - Collective Bargaining - Exclusive Representative Duty of Fair Representation MC 26-19 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 561
Appropriations
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0304 /CH0167 Montgomery County - Authority of County Council Over Inspector General - Montgomery College MC 12-19 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 167
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0333 Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Breweries and Farm Breweries MC 18-19 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0334 /CH0633 Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Community Performing Arts Facility Special Event Permit MC 30-19 By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 633
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0335 /CH0634 Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Fee Refunds MC 28-19 By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 634
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0344 /CH0168 Montgomery County - Authority of County Council Over Inspector General - Housing Opportunities Commission MC 7-19 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 168
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0345 /CH0637 Montgomery County – Damascus – Alcoholic Beverages Licenses MC 9–19 By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 637
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0562 Montgomery County - Sale of Residential Real Property - Septic Systems Outreach Toolkit MC 16-19 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0563 /CH0169 Montgomery County - Gaming and Benefit Performances - Repeal MC 14-19 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 169
Ways and Means
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0564 /CH0170 Montgomery County - Gaming - Bingo Games MC 1-19 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 170
Ways and Means
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0614 Montgomery County - Vehicle Laws - Prohibited Acts at Intersections MC 10-19 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0616 /CH0673 Montgomery County - Department of Liquor Control - Renaming MC 2-19 By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 673
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0624 Montgomery County - Voting Methods MC 29-19 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0628 Montgomery County - Residential Leases - Just Cause Eviction MC 22-19 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0642 Montgomery County - Uniformity of Property Tax Assessments - Use of Pesticides by Country Clubs and Golf Courses MC 11-19 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0651 Montgomery County - Country Clubs and Golf Courses - Rate of Assessment and Term of Agreements MC 27-19 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:14 PM