Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Capital Projects - High Performance Buildings - Maryland Green Building Council
Sponsored by
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee and Chair, Appropriations Committee (By Request - Departmental - General Services)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 589
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of a "high performance building" as it applies to specified provisions of law relating to State capital projects; and requiring the Maryland Green Building Council to establish a process for receiving public input.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {816784/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 589
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2014 1/16/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
House 1/22/2014 1/22/2014 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
House 3/12/2014 3/14/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Favorable with Amendments {816784/1 Report Adopted 47
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 48A
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Senate Rules 47
Senate 3/28/2014 3/31/2014 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/28/2014 3/28/2014 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/04/2014 4/04/2014 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 589
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM