Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Overtaking and Passing Bicycles, Farm Equipment, Farm Tractors, and Animal-Drawn Vehicles
Sponsored by
Delegate Cassilly
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the driver of a vehicle to drive on the left side of the roadway in a no-passing zone to overtake and pass a bicycle, farm equipment, a farm tractor, or an animal-drawn vehicle in accordance with a certain provision of law.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0268
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Overtaking and Passing Bicycles, Farm Equipment, Farm Tractors, and Animal-Drawn Vehicles
House 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-305, 21-307 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM