Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Motor Vehicles - Operation - Transportation Emergencies
Sponsored by
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee (By Request - Departmental - Transportation)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 256
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Secretary of Transportation to waive specified safety regulations for commercial motor vehicles in intrastate travel to facilitate specified emergency relief efforts; establishing 20 days as the maximum total period of time that a specified transportation emergency may extend; authorizing the Governor to take specified action to facilitate emergency relief efforts through a declaration of a state of emergency if the duration of the transportation emergency conditions extends for more than 20 days; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2016
Legislative Date
1/25/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {410312/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 256
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2016 1/25/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
House 2/25/2016 2/29/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments {410312/1 Report Adopted 35
House 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
House 3/03/2016 3/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 37
Senate 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 37
Senate 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 61
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 256
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   25-111 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM