Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Transportation, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0229 /CH0256
Title
Commercial Motor Vehicles - Operation - Transportation Emergencies
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0503 /CH0268
Title
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Compact - Board of Directors - Appointing Authority for Federal Members
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0080 /CH0158
Title
Commercial Drivers' Licenses - Cancellations and Downgrades (Driving Privilege Preservation Act of 2016)
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0101
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Labor Relations - Resolution of Labor Disputes
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0229 /CH0256 Commercial Motor Vehicles - Operation - Transportation Emergencies By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 256
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2016 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0503 /CH0268 Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Compact - Board of Directors - Appointing Authority for Federal Members By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 268
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0080 /CH0158 Commercial Drivers' Licenses - Cancellations and Downgrades (Driving Privilege Preservation Act of 2016) By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 158
Judicial Proceedings
1/19/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0101 Maryland Transit Administration - Labor Relations - Resolution of Labor Disputes By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/28/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM
Click to return on the top page