Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership
Sponsored by
Allegany County Delegation and Washington County Delegation
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the membership of the Correctional Officers' Retirement System to include Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services employees in certain positions on or after July 1, 2019; requiring a certain transfer and combination of certain service credit for certain individuals; requiring the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System to calculate a certain disability benefit for certain individuals and to grant a certain benefit under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0278
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2019
Legislative Date
1/29/2019
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership
House 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 Hearing canceled
House 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM