Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Protection of Information - Revisions (Maryland Data Privacy Act)
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Adams, Anderton, Arentz, Arikan, Beitzel, Chisholm, Ciliberti, Clark, Corderman, Ghrist, Grammer, Griffith, Hartman, Howard, Jacobs, Kipke, Kittleman, Krebs, Long, Malone, Mautz, McComas, McKay, Metzgar, Morgan, Otto, Reilly, Rose, Saab, Szeliga, Wivell, Bagnall, Barron, Belcastro, Bhandari, Charles, Cullison, Hill, Johnson, Kelly, Kerr, R. Lewis, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Rosenberg, and K. Young
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring certain units of State government to comply with certain standards and guidelines to ensure that the security of all information systems and applications is managed through a certain framework; requiring certain units of State government to undertake activities comprising collection, processing, and sharing of personally identifiable information in good faith; establishing that certain provisions of law do not apply to public institutions of higher education; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0274
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {596389/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
49
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Government - Protection of Information - Revisions (Maryland Data Privacy Act)
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 Hearing canceled
House 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing canceled
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable with Amendments {596389/1 Adopted 47A
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - State Government - Protection of Information - Revisions (Maryland Data Privacy Act)
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 48
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 49
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-1301 through 10-1304, 10-1305 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:45 PM