Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Harford County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights
Sponsored by
Harford County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 31
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Adding Harford County to the provisions of law relating to the Cecil County, Garrett County, and St. Mary's County Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights; providing that specified provisions of law relating to hearing board procedures and the finality of specified hearing board decisions do not apply in Harford County; and defining terms.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0216
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Special Order until 2/20 (Delegate Olszewski) Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Impallaria) {123329/1 Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/22/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2013
Legislative Date
4/09/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 31
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2013 1/25/2013 First Reading Appropriations
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/15/2013 2/18/2013 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 30
House 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 Special Order until 2/20 (Delegate Olszewski) Adopted 30
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Floor Amendment (Delegate Impallaria) {123329/1 Adopted 31
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31
House 2/22/2013 2/22/2013 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 33
Senate 2/25/2013 2/25/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 32
Senate 3/29/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 4/09/2013 4/09/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 31
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-1001, 11-1002, 11-1008, 11-1009 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM