Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
St. Mary's County - Building Authority Commission - Repeal
Sponsored by
St. Mary's County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 181
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing certain provisions of law that relate to the Building Authority Commission in St. Mary's County.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - St. Mary's County - Building Authority Commission - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - St. Mary's County - Building Authority Commission - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 181
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - St. Mary's County - Building Authority Commission - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - St. Mary's County - Building Authority Commission - Repeal
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 40
Text - Third - St. Mary's County - Building Authority Commission - Repeal
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 42
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 42
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/26/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted 55
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 181
Text - Chapter - St. Mary's County - Building Authority Commission - Repeal
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM