Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

St. Mary's County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0358 /CH0180
Title
St. Mary's County - Public Facility Bonds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0359 /CH0181
Title
St. Mary's County - Building Authority Commission - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0360 /CH0182
Title
St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales at a Bar or Counter
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0484
Title
St. Mary's County - Charitable or Fundraising Campaign Fraud - Police Dispatcher
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0819
Title
St. Mary's County - County Income Tax - Credit for Employees of Targeted Businesses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0982 /CH0708
Title
St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class C Per Diem Licenses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0358 /CH0180 St. Mary's County - Public Facility Bonds By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 180
Appropriations
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0359 /CH0181 St. Mary's County - Building Authority Commission - Repeal By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 181
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0360 /CH0182 St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales at a Bar or Counter By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 182
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0484 St. Mary's County - Charitable or Fundraising Campaign Fraud - Police Dispatcher By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0819 St. Mary's County - County Income Tax - Credit for Employees of Targeted Businesses By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0982 /CH0708 St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class C Per Diem Licenses By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 708
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:14 PM