Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Personal Injury Protection Coverage - Prohibition on Premium Increase
Sponsored by
Chair, Economic Matters Committee (By Request - Departmental - Insurance Administration, Maryland)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 111
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting an insurer that issues a motor vehicle liability insurance policy that contains personal injury protection coverage from increasing the premium on the policy due to a claim or payment made under that coverage; defining "increase the premium" to include an increase in total premium for a policy due to a surcharge, retiering or other reclassification of the policy, or removal or reduction of a discount; altering a specified notice requirement; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/14/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/15/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/15/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2013
Legislative Date
4/09/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 111
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2013 1/25/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/25/2013 1/25/2013 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/13/2013 2/14/2013 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 2/15/2013 2/15/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 28
House 2/15/2013 2/15/2013 Second Reading Passed 28
House 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 30
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 First Reading Finance 29
Senate 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/28/2013 3/29/2013 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 56
Senate 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Second Reading Passed 56
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 59
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 Returned Passed 60A
Post Passage 4/09/2013 4/09/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 111
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-507 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM