Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Insurance Administration, Maryland

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0360 /CH0106
Title
Health Insurance - Repeal of Obsolete Provisions of Law
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0361 /CH0368
Title
Health Insurance - Conformity with and Implementation of Federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0392 /CH0111
Title
Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Personal Injury Protection Coverage - Prohibition on Premium Increase
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0431 /CH0115
Title
Insurance - Maryland Insurance Acquisitions Disclosure and Control Act - Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0724 /CH0385
Title
Insurance - Risk Based Capital Standards - Fraternal Benefit Societies and Life Insurers
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0360 /CH0106 Health Insurance - Repeal of Obsolete Provisions of Law By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 106
Health and Government Operations
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0361 /CH0368 Health Insurance - Conformity with and Implementation of Federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 368
Health and Government Operations
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0392 /CH0111 Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Personal Injury Protection Coverage - Prohibition on Premium Increase By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 111
Economic Matters
1/31/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0431 /CH0115 Insurance - Maryland Insurance Acquisitions Disclosure and Control Act - Revisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 115
Economic Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0724 /CH0385 Insurance - Risk Based Capital Standards - Fraternal Benefit Societies and Life Insurers By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 385
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM
Click to return on the top page