Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Notary Public - Appointment
Sponsored by
Delegate Ready
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a State Senator to delegate to the Secretary of State the Senator's authority to approve an applicant for notary public; authorizing the Governor to appoint and commission, under specified circumstances, an individual as a notary public on approval by the Secretary; and requiring an application for notary public, under specified circumstances, to bear or be accompanied by the written approval of the Secretary.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0190
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0169 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2013
Legislative Date
1/28/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-2)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-2)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2013 1/28/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/04/2013 3/05/2013 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 41
House 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Second Reading Passed 41
House 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 Third Reading Passed (134-2) 43
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 42
Senate 3/29/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed (45-2) 60
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-101, 18-103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM