Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Children With Disabilities and Child Care Providers - Dispute Resolution Process
Sponsored by
Delegates Kaiser, Barve, Buckel, Chang, Ebersole, Frick, Hornberger, Jalisi, Jones, Kelly, Korman, Lierman, McDonough, Patterson, Queen, Reznik, Sophocleus, Turner, A. Washington, M. Washington, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 713
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Education to develop a dispute resolution process to be used by families of children with disabilities and child care providers for resolving complaints of discrimination based on a child's disability; requiring the Department, in developing the dispute resolution process, to convene a workgroup that includes representatives of specified entities; requiring the Department to submit to the General Assembly, by October 1, 2017, a report outlining the process and its implementation; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0943
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {275262/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (126-13)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 713
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Family Child Care Homes and Child Care Centers - Dispute Resolution Process - Regulations
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Favorable with Amendments {275262/1 Adopted 45
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Children With Disabilities and Child Care Providers - Dispute Resolution Process
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Third Reading Passed (126-13) 46
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 45
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable Adopted 58
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Second Reading Passed 58
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 59
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 713
Text - Chapter - Children With Disabilities and Child Care Providers - Dispute Resolution Process
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM