Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Long-Term Care Insurance - Premium Rates
Sponsored by
Delegates Kramer, Aumann, Barkley, Carey, Chang, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Krimm, Morales, Stein, Valderrama, Angel, Barron, Bromwell, Cullison, Hayes, Hill, Kelly, Kipke, Krebs, McDonough, Metzgar, Miele, Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Platt, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Szeliga, West, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 672
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to provide information on the Maryland Insurance Administration's Web site describing specified factors and a specified process relating to premium rates for policies or contracts of long-term care insurance; requiring the Administration to make a specified assessment and determination relating to nonforfeiture benefits and to report its findings to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2018; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Long-Term Care Insurance - Premium Rates
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {486886/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Long-Term Care Insurance - Premium Rates
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-1)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Reassigned to Finance
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 672
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Long-Term Care Insurance - Premium Rates
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Long-Term Care Insurance - Premium Rates
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Favorable with Amendments {486886/1 Adopted 45
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Long-Term Care Insurance - Premium Rates
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Third Reading Passed (135-1) 46A
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 45
Senate 3/23/2017 3/21/2017 Reassigned to Finance 50
Senate 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable Adopted 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63A
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Returned Passed 69
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 672
Text - Chapter - Long-Term Care Insurance - Premium Rates
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-701 through 11-704, 18-103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM