Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Protective Headgear Requirement for Motorcycle Riders - Exception
Sponsored by
Delegates Bromwell, Anderson, Anderton, Arentz, Aumann, Buckel, Cassilly, Cluster, Fisher, Fraser-Hidalgo, Glass, Grammer, Impallaria, Kipke, Kittleman, Knotts, Kramer, Krebs, Mautz, McDonough, Metzgar, W. Miller, Morgan, O'Donnell, Oaks, Reilly, Rey, Simonaire, Szeliga, Vaughn, and B. Wilson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that the prohibition against operating or riding on a motorcycle without specified protective headgear does not apply to an individual at least 21 years old who has been licensed to operate a motorcycle for at least 2 years, has completed a specified motorcycle safety course, or is a passenger on a motorcycle operated by a driver who has been licensed for at least 2 years or completed a specified motorcycle safety course.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2016 2/03/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/03/2016 3/07/2016 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-1306 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM