Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Care Facilities - Comprehensive and Extended Care Facilities - Discharges and Transfers
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Office of the Attorney General) and Delegates Atterbeary, D.E. Davis, Fennell, Gaines, Kelly, Sample-Hughes, Stein, Wilson, Pendergrass, Pena-Melnyk, Bagnall, Barron, Bhandari, Carr, Charles, Chisholm, Cullison, Hill, Johnson, Kerr, Kipke, Krebs, R. Lewis, Metzgar, Morgan, Rosenberg, Saab, Szeliga, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 545
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the basic rights afforded to each resident of a comprehensive care facility and an extended care facility; requiring certain individuals to pursue certain assistance from the medical assistance program in a certain manner; requiring a facility to provide a certain written notice as soon as practicable before discharge or transfer under certain circumstances; requiring a facility, under certain provisions of law, to provide at least a 3-day supply of medications needed by the resident at the time of discharge or transfer; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0669
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {396689/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-1)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {237372/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
59A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 545
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Care Facilities - Comprehensive and Extended Care Facilities - Discharges and Transfers
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {396689/1 Adopted 48
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Health Care Facilities - Comprehensive and Extended Care Facilities - Discharges and Transfers
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (134-1) 49
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Finance 48
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {237372/1 Adopted 58
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59A
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 62
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 62
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Health Care Facilities - Comprehensive and Extended Care Facilities - Discharges and Transfers
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 545
Text - Chapter - Health Care Facilities - Comprehensive and Extended Care Facilities - Discharges and Transfers
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-343, 19-344, 19-345, 19-345.1, 19-345.2, 19-345.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM