Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Attorney General, Office Of The

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0592 /CH0545 (SB0669)
Title
Health Care Facilities - Comprehensive and Extended Care Facilities - Discharges and Transfers
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0593 (SB0485)
Title
Maryland Collection Agency Licensing Act - Definitions and Legislative Intent
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0594 /CH0546 (SB0670)
Title
Financial Institutions - Student Loan Servicers - Unfair, Abusive, or Deceptive Trade Practices
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0485 (HB0593)
Title
Maryland Collection Agency Licensing Act - Definitions and Legislative Intent
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0669 (HB0592/CH0545)
Title
Health Care Facilities - Comprehensive and Extended Care Facilities - Discharges and Transfers
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0670 (HB0594/CH0546)
Title
Financial Institutions - Student Loan Servicers - Unfair, Abusive, or Deceptive Trade Practices
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0592 /CH0545 (SB0669) Health Care Facilities - Comprehensive and Extended Care Facilities - Discharges and Transfers By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 545
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0593 (SB0485) Maryland Collection Agency Licensing Act - Definitions and Legislative Intent By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Economic Matters
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0594 /CH0546 (SB0670) Financial Institutions - Student Loan Servicers - Unfair, Abusive, or Deceptive Trade Practices By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 546
Economic Matters
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0485 (HB0593) Maryland Collection Agency Licensing Act - Definitions and Legislative Intent By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/12/2019 - 9:00 AM
SB0669 (HB0592/CH0545) Health Care Facilities - Comprehensive and Extended Care Facilities - Discharges and Transfers By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0670 (HB0594/CH0546) Financial Institutions - Student Loan Servicers - Unfair, Abusive, or Deceptive Trade Practices By Request - Other 6 2 In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Finance
3/12/2019 - 9:00 AM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:14 PM