Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Collection Agency Licensing Act - Definitions and Legislative Intent
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Office of the Attorney General) and Delegates Anderson, Atterbeary, Barron, Branch, Bromwell, Brooks, Charkoudian, Clippinger, Crosby, Cullison, D.E. Davis, Dumais, Fennell, Gaines, Glenn, Hettleman, Hill, Holmes, Kelly, Kipke, Korman, R. Lewis, Lierman, Lisanti, Luedtke, Moon, Mosby, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Queen, Sample-Hughes, Stein, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Wilson, and Sydnor
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Defining the term "mortgage lender" to mean a person that is duly licensed under certain provisions of the Financial Institutions Article; clarifying the definition of the term "consumer claim"; and declaring the intent of the General Assembly that the Act be construed as clarifying the Maryland Collection Agency Licensing Act and that, with regard to sales of real property to bona fide purchasers, the Act applies only to sales made on or after the June 1, 2019.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Rules
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0485
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {483995/1 Adopted
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (98-39)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
56
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Maryland Collection Agency Licensing Act - Definitions and Legislative Intent
House 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/26/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments {483995/1 Adopted 53A
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53A
Text - Third - Maryland Collection Agency Licensing Act - Definitions and Legislative Intent
House 3/27/2019 3/19/2019 Third Reading Passed (98-39) 54
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Referred Rules 56
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM