Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Provider Panels - Registered Psychology Associates
Sponsored by
Delegates Ghrist, Arentz, Jacobs, Kelly, and Valentino-Smith
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a carrier from rejecting a provider who provides community-based health services for an accredited program solely because the provider is a registered psychology associate.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health Insurance - Provider Panels - Registered Psychology Associates
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Health Insurance - Provider Panels - Registered Psychology Associates
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
33
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Insurance - Provider Panels - Registered Psychology Associates
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 30
Text - Third - Health Insurance - Provider Panels - Registered Psychology Associates
House 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 32
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Referred Finance 33
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/21/2020 2:55 PM