Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Essential Off-Patent or Generic Drugs - Price Gouging - Prohibition
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Office of the Attorney General) and Delegates Bromwell, Anderson, Atterbeary, Barkley, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Barron, Barve, Beidle, Brooks, Carr, Chang, Clippinger, Conaway, Cullison, Davis, Dumais, Ebersole, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Frush, Gaines, Gilchrist, Glenn, Gutierrez, Hayes, Haynes, Healey, Hettleman, Hill, Hixson, Holmes, C. Howard, Jackson, Jalisi, Jameson, Jones, Kelly, Knotts, Krimm, Lafferty, Lam, R. Lewis, Lierman, Lisanti, Luedtke, McCray, McIntosh, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Oaks, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Proctor, Queen, Reznik, Robinson, Rosenberg, Sample-Hughes, Sanchez, Sophocleus, Stein, Sydnor, Tarlau, Turner, Valderrama, Vallario, Waldstreicher, Walker, A. Washington, M. Washington, C. Wilson, K. Young, P. Young, Pendergrass, Angel, Kipke, McDonough, Metzgar, Miele, Saab, West, Aumann, Carey, Mautz, and S. Howard
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 818
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a manufacturer or wholesale distributor from engaging in price gouging in the sale of an essential off-patent or generic drug; establishing that it is not a violation of a specified provision of the Act for a wholesale distributor to increase a price of an essential off-patent or generic drug under specified circumstances; authorizing the Maryland Medical Assistance Program to notify the Attorney General of an increase in the price of an essential off-patent or generic drug under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0415
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Health - Essential Generic Drugs - Price Gouging - Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {376789/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-4)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {247274/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/6 (Senator Feldman) Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {943322/2 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {683326/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (13-32)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {893327/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (14-31)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (38-7)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-2)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2017
Legislative Date
5/27/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 818
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Economic Matters
Text - First - Public Health - Essential Generic Drugs - Price Gouging - Prohibition
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/20/2017 3/20/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Favorable with Amendments {376789/1 Adopted 50
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
Text - Third - Public Health - Essential Off-Patent or Generic Drugs - Price Gouging - Prohibition
House 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-4) 51
Senate 3/21/2017 3/19/2017 Referred Finance 48
Senate 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments {247274/1 Adopted 59
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Motion Special Order until 4/6 (Senator Feldman) Adopted 59
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Floor Amendment {943322/2 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 60
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Floor Amendment {683326/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (13-32) 61
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Floor Amendment {893327/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (14-31) 61
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (38-7) 61
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 67
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-2) 67
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Public Health - Essential Off-Patent or Generic Drugs - Price Gouging - Prohibition
Post Passage 5/27/2017 5/27/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 818
Text - Chapter - Public Health - Essential Off-Patent or Generic Drugs - Price Gouging - Prohibition
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-801 through 2-803 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM