Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Commuter Benefits Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Arora, Anderson, McIntosh, and Howard
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 605
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Transit Administration to include in a specified transit plan improvements to its fare payment systems; specifying that the plan allow the Administration to process fare media in electronic form and provide electronic fare media for distribution to employees as part of a commuter benefits program; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/14/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/14/2014
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {815161/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-1)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 605
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2014 1/30/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/14/2014 2/14/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/14/2014 2/14/2014 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/04/2014 3/04/2014 Favorable with Amendments {815161/1 Report Adopted 40
House 3/04/2014 3/04/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
House 3/06/2014 3/06/2014 Third Reading Passed (135-1) 42
Senate 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 First Reading Finance 41
Senate 3/11/2014 3/11/2014 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/02/2014 4/03/2014 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 61
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 605
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM