Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Stormwater Remediation Fees and Stormwater Charges - Property Subject to Fees and Charges
Sponsored by
Delegates Barve, Carr, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Gilchrist, Krimm, Lafferty, McCray, McIntosh, Platt, Robinson, Stein, and Valentino-Smith
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing a specified exception to an exemption from specified taxes, user charges, and utility fees relating to stormwater for property owned by a county; exempting a public college or university or a local school system from being charged a stormwater remediation fee by a county or municipality, subject to a specified exception; repealing specified provisions of law authorizing a county or municipality to impose stormwater remediation fees and stormwater charges on property owned by the State or a unit of State government; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0472
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1108 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {710518/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-5)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
46A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Environment - Municipal Stormwater Charges - Property Subject to Charges
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/18/2017 3/18/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable with Amendments {710518/1 Adopted 49
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
Text - Third - Environment - Stormwater Remediation Fees and Stormwater Charges - Property Subject to Fees and Charges
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Third Reading Passed (128-5) 50
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Budget and Taxation 46A
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-202.1, 4-204 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM