Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pharmacists - Administration of Self-Administered Medications and Maintenance Injectable Medications
Sponsored by
Delegates K. Young, Bagnall, Brooks, Carr, Kipke, Krebs, R. Lewis, Moon, Solomon, and Terrasa
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a pharmacist who meets the requirements of certain regulations to administer a maintenance injectable medication to a patient under certain circumstances; requiring the State Board of Pharmacy, on or before September 1, 2021, and in consultation with the State Board of Physicians and the State Board of Nursing, to adopt certain regulations requiring pharmacists to complete a certain training program in order to administer a maintenance injectable medication; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0545
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Pharmacists - Administration of Self-Administered Medications and Maintenance Injectable Medications
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-716 )
Last Updated: 2/19/2020 1:42 PM