Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Glenn Dale Hospital Property MC/PG 110-19
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 165
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission to sell, lease, or otherwise transfer a certain portion of the Glenn Dale Hospital property to a person who will adaptively reuse, at a minimum, the main hospital campus buildings on the property by returning the property to a state of utility by certain means; and requiring that repairs and alterations to the property give it a contemporary use and preserve features of the property that are historically, architecturally, and culturally significant.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {110610/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 165
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Glenn Dale Hospital Property MC/PG 110-19
House 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments {110610/1 Adopted 46
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Glenn Dale Hospital Property MC/PG 110-19
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 48
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47A
Senate 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 165
Text - Chapter - Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Glenn Dale Hospital Property MC/PG 110-19
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   17-402 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM