Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Montgomery County Delegation & Prince George's Co Deleg

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0324 /CH0161
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Discrimination - Prohibited in Contracts MC/PG 107-19
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0325 /CH0162
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Indirect Customer Assistance Program MC/PG 105-19
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0326 /CH0163
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Office of the Inspector General - Technical Changes MC/PG 104-19
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0352 /CH0164
Title
Property Tax Credits – Maryland–National Capital Park and Planning Commission Park Police Officers and Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission Police Officers MC/PG 108–19
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0362 /CH0562
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Collective Bargaining - Exclusive Representative Duty of Fair Representation MC/PG 109-19
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0621
Title
Montgomery County - Land Use Documents - Certification MC/PG 106-19
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0647 (SB0202)
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Water Leakage - Billing MC/PG 113-19
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0662 /CH0165
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Glenn Dale Hospital Property MC/PG 110-19
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0674
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Moratorium and Study on Advanced Metering Infrastructure MC/PG 101-19
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0678 /CH0166
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Prince George's County Recreation Programs - Youth Sports Program and Division MC/PG 115-19
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1279 /CH0354
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Procurement - Source Selection MC/PG 112-19
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1280 /CH0563
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Collective Bargaining - Technical Unit MC/PG 114-19
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0324 /CH0161 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Discrimination - Prohibited in Contracts MC/PG 107-19 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 161
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0325 /CH0162 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Indirect Customer Assistance Program MC/PG 105-19 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 162
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0326 /CH0163 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Office of the Inspector General - Technical Changes MC/PG 104-19 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 163
Environment and Transportation
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0352 /CH0164 Property Tax Credits – Maryland–National Capital Park and Planning Commission Park Police Officers and Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission Police Officers MC/PG 108–19 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 164
Ways and Means
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0362 /CH0562 Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Collective Bargaining - Exclusive Representative Duty of Fair Representation MC/PG 109-19 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 562
Appropriations
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0621 Montgomery County - Land Use Documents - Certification MC/PG 106-19 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0647 (SB0202) Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Water Leakage - Billing MC/PG 113-19 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB0662 /CH0165 Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Glenn Dale Hospital Property MC/PG 110-19 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 165
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0674 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Moratorium and Study on Advanced Metering Infrastructure MC/PG 101-19 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0678 /CH0166 Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Prince George's County Recreation Programs - Youth Sports Program and Division MC/PG 115-19 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 166
Environment and Transportation
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1279 /CH0354 Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Procurement - Source Selection MC/PG 112-19 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 354
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1280 /CH0563 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Collective Bargaining - Technical Unit MC/PG 114-19 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 563
Appropriations
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:14 PM