Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Personnel - Law Enforcement Employees - Extra Compensation
Sponsored by
Delegates DeBoy, Barkley, Beidle, Frick, Lafferty, B. Robinson, and Sophocleus
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 131
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Specifying that a law enforcement employee of any unit of State government, instead of only specified law enforcement employees of the Department of State Police and the Department of Natural Resources, who works on specified holidays is entitled to extra compensation; making the Act contingent on the execution of a specified preliminary agreement; requiring the Secretary of Budget and Management to give specified notices to the Department of Legislative Services; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 2 of the bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {174560/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-9)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2013
Legislative Date
4/09/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 131
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2013 3/14/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/18/2013 3/15/2013 Favorable with Amendments {174560/1 Report Adopted 48A
House 3/18/2013 3/15/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48A
House 3/19/2013 3/16/2013 Third Reading Passed (130-9) 49
Senate 3/20/2013 3/18/2013 First Reading Finance 49
Senate 3/20/2013 3/20/2013 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2013 4/02/2013 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 4/09/2013 4/09/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 131
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM