Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Checkoff - Maryland Veterans Trust Fund
Sponsored by
Delegates C. Wilson, Afzali, Beidle, Bromwell, Brooks, Carozza, Chang, Davis, Dumais, Hill, S. Howard, Kramer, Lam, McConkey, McDonough, McKay, O'Donnell, Otto, Proctor, Reznik, Smith, Sophocleus, Vogt, D. Barnes, Buckel, Ebersole, Fennell, Hixson, Hornberger, C. Howard, Kaiser, Long, Luedtke, Metzgar, Patterson, Platt, Reilly, Shoemaker, Simonaire, Tarlau, Turner, Walker, A. Washington, and M. Washington
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing an income tax checkoff system for voluntary contributions to the Maryland Veterans Trust Fund; requiring the Comptroller to include a checkoff on the individual income tax return; requiring the Comptroller to collect and account for contributions made through the checkoff system and to credit the proceeds to the Fund after deducting the amount necessary to administer the checkoff system; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2014; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Rules
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1521 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {975362/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
54
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2015 2/12/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/26/2015 3/27/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/27/2015 3/25/2015 Favorable with Amendments {975362/1 Report Adopted 55
House 3/27/2015 3/25/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
House 3/31/2015 3/27/2015 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 57
Senate 4/01/2015 3/27/2015 First Reading Senate Rules 54
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-804, 2-115 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM