Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance - Risk Based Capital Standards - Fraternal Benefit Societies and Life Insurers
Sponsored by
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee (By Request - Departmental - Insurance Administration, Maryland)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 385
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that a fraternal benefit society's risk based capital be determined in accordance with a specified formula set forth in specified instructions; altering the circumstances under which a company action level event occurs in the case of a life insurer; establishing the circumstances under which a company action level event occurs for a fraternal benefit society; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/04/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 385
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2013 2/04/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/04/2013 3/05/2013 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 41
House 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Second Reading Passed 41
House 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 43
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 First Reading Finance 42
Senate 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/28/2013 3/29/2013 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 56
Senate 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Second Reading Passed 56
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 59
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 Returned Passed 60A
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 385
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-301, 4-304, 4-305, 4-308, 8-403 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM