Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicles - Use of Wireless Communication Device - Prohibited Acts, Enforcement, and Penalties
Sponsored by
Delegates Malone, Kach, Clagett, Barkley, Bobo, Hogan, Howard, Lafferty, A. Miller, Murphy, Pendergrass, Reznik, Stein, Weir, Glenn, Beidle, Cane, Carr, Healey, S. Robinson, and Wilson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 637
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing provisions of law that require enforcement as a secondary offense of specified violations involving the use of a wireless communication device while operating a motor vehicle; altering the penalty imposed for a violation of a specified prohibition on the use of a handheld telephone while operating a motor vehicle; prohibiting an assessment of points for violation of a prohibition on the use of a handheld telephone while operating a motor vehicle unless the offense contributes to an accident; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0339
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0104 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {610219/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (106-29)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {688374/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (41-6)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Delegates Malone, Stein, and McMillan
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Senate Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Senators Brochin, Raskin, and Shank
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (110-28)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (40-5)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 637
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2013 2/06/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2013 3/20/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Favorable with Amendments {610219/1 Report Adopted 50
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
House 3/21/2013 3/18/2013 Third Reading Passed (106-29) 51
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 51
Senate 3/29/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable with Amendments {688374/1 Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (41-6) 60
House 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments 63
House 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 House Requests Senate Recede 63
House 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Conference Committee Appointed 63
House 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Delegates Malone, Stein, and McMillan 63
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Senate Refuses to Recede 64
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Conference Committee Appointed 64
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Senators Brochin, Raskin, and Shank 64
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Conference Committee Report Adopted 67
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Third Reading Passed (110-28) 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Conference Committee Report Adopted 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Third Reading Passed (40-5) 66
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Passed Enrolled 66
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 637
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-1124, 21-1124.2, 27-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM