Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Board of Education - Retention Policy for Financial Records
Sponsored by
Delegate Long
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Baltimore County Board of Education to adopt a retention policy for the financial records of the Baltimore County public school system on or before January 1, 2021; and requiring the retention policy to require retention of all financial records for 7 years, the Board to designate a custodian of records, the custodian to certify any records that have been digitally stored for 7 years or more, and all financial records to be backed up in a secure secondary cloud-based location.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Baltimore County - Board of Education - Retention Policy for Financial Records
House 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-138 )
Last Updated: 2/20/2020 10:15 AM