Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Office of Legislative Audits - Performance Audits - Local Alcoholic Beverages Licensing Boards
Sponsored by
Delegates Barkley, Arentz, Branch, Brooks, S. Howard, Lisanti, and W. Miller
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 524
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Office of Legislative Audits, at the request of the President of the Senate and the Speaker of the House, to conduct a performance audit of the local alcoholic beverages licensing board for a county or the City of Annapolis to evaluate the effectiveness and efficiency of the board's management practices and use of resources; authorizing the employees and specified representatives of the Office of Legislative Audits to have access to specified records; requiring specified audit reports to be sent to specified persons; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {843494/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {879238/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 524
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Office of Legislative Audits - Performance Audits of Boards of License Commissioners - Required
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Favorable with Amendments {843494/1 Adopted 43
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
Text - Third - Office of Legislative Audits - Performance Audits - Local Alcoholic Beverages Licensing Boards
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 45
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Referred Budget and Taxation 44
Senate 3/21/2017 3/21/2017 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments {879238/1 Adopted 60
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 62
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 68
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 68
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Office of Legislative Audits - Performance Audits - Local Alcoholic Beverages Licensing Boards
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 524
Text - Chapter - Office of Legislative Audits - Performance Audits - Local Alcoholic Beverages Licensing Boards
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-1220, 2-1223, 2-1224 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM