Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Participation in Program - City of Hyattsville and Satellite Organizations
Sponsored by
Chair, Appropriations Committee (By Request - Departmental - Budget and Management)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 239
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing an employee or a former employee of the City of Hyattsville and a surviving spouse or dependent child of the employee or former employee to enroll and participate in the State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program under specified circumstances; authorizing the State to charge the City of Hyattsville and specified entities specified costs resulting from specified individuals participating in the Program; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 239
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2014 2/05/2014 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2014 3/10/2014 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 44
House 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Second Reading Passed 44
House 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 45
Senate 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 First Reading Senate Rules 44
Senate 3/19/2014 3/20/2014 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/20/2014 3/20/2014 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/03/2014 4/04/2014 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 239
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM